Financial history Friends of Kings' Forest Primary

Charity number: 1122494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.61k £4.58k £9.63k £14.78k £19.09k
Total expenditure £2.92k £4.47k £9.04k £12.42k £19.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 £250