Accounts and annual returns SOUTH AFRICAN ARTS TRUST (SAAT)

Charity number: 1123601
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 29 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 20 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 02 August 2010 On Time