Financial history THE BRIGHT FUTURE TRUST

Charity number: 1123531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £271.69k £253.12k £315.87k £205.60k £245.96k
Total expenditure £155.77k £198.31k £267.36k £117.52k £165.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A