Accounts and annual returns RANELAGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1125897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 September 2024 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 September 2024 455 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 September 2024 455 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required