Accounts and annual returns CHHATAK ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1123480
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 08 August 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 August 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 September 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 August 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required