Financial history BRITISH IRAQI FRIENDSHIP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1123208
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £49.44k £42.17k £38.97k £11.76k £0
Total expenditure £55.71k £42.57k £45.54k £10.61k £7.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A