Accounts and annual returns FRUITY FACES TRUST

Charity number: 1123135
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 17 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2013 30 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 10 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 14 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required