Financial history BOLTON DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity Number: 1123776
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £149.34k £117.22k £73.90k £103.25k £163.00k
Total expenditure £104.05k £78.95k £103.59k £120.28k £128.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £132.05k
Income from government grants £87.73k £78.72k £40.00k £41.00k N/A