Accounts and annual returns LIFE MAP PLANNERS

Charity Number: 1123340
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 10 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 30 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 11 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 27 December 2012 On Time