Financial history FINHUMF

Charity number: 1123293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.00k £86.15k £70.00k £151.94k £172.95k
Total expenditure £5.00k £52.81k £130.00k £18.22k £117.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A