Accounts and annual returns Y-GEN

Charity number: 1123371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 30 May 2013 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 20 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 16 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 16 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 09 June 2011 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 29 November 2010 On Time