Accounts and annual returns RIGUL TRUST

Charity number: 1124076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window