Accounts and annual returns THE KANKA-GAJENDRA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124124
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1133 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1133 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1498 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1498 days