Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF MBA ZAMBIA

Charity number: 1123826
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 December 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required