Financial history BEN RHYDDING PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1123710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £96.01k £116.79k £139.33k £129.35k £128.27k
Total expenditure £96.93k £117.27k £141.22k £138.34k £142.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £85.29k N/A £71.62k
Income from government grants £6.32k N/A N/A £71.56k N/A