Financial history HEARTBEAT UK

Charity number: 1124786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £15.03k £4.75k £32.09k £43.57k £39.77k
Total expenditure £11.38k £6.98k £27.51k £45.87k £42.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A