Accounts and annual returns THE LIVITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1124007
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2012 02 April 2013 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not Required