Financial history MADRASA IBRAHIM

Charity number: 1126042
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £44.66k £64.91k £46.98k £45.91k £67.85k
Total expenditure £28.70k £25.69k £23.39k £26.86k £46.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.46k £11.96k N/A N/A