Financial history THE PHOENIX INTERNATIONAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 1124224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.24k £16.08k £16.46k £18.26k £0
Total expenditure £2.29k £21.35k £15.54k £9.58k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A