Financial history DAIMLER GREEN COMMUNITY RECREATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1125079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.87k £40.47k £23.65k £30.87k £29.82k
Total expenditure £13.57k £21.39k £40.88k £45.86k £38.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £33.76k £16.60k N/A N/A