Accounts and annual returns PARKHILL CHAPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1124349
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 31 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 29 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 29 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 04 February 2013 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required