Accounts and annual returns RESURRECTION POWER AND LIVING BREAD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1124518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 April 2024 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2024 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2022 07 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 April 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2020 18 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window