Financial history KINGS CHURCH UCKFIELD

Charity number: 1124576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £230.37k £225.90k £192.27k £154.84k £625.94k
Total expenditure £167.17k £119.98k £147.55k £160.72k £146.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.94k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £610.93k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.89k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £120
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £146.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0