Financial history PEOPLE WITHOUT LIMITS

Charity number: 1124666
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 30/06/2016
Total gross income £414.55k £380.16k £371.82k £393.59k £95.12k
Total expenditure £505.93k £378.68k £377.41k £377.88k £124.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0