Financial history OLIVE TREE RECONCILIATION FUND

Charity number: 1125706
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £58.46k £112.00k £96.26k £74.53k £57.76k
Total expenditure £66.80k £125.01k £91.16k £69.43k £74.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A