Financial history THE KIDS FUN CLUB (RHYL & DISTRICT)

Charity number: 1125564
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £21.92k £38.30k £28.32k £65.56k £39.71k
Total expenditure £18.43k £33.49k £30.90k £48.02k £46.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A