Financial history NEW ZEALAND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1132185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.01k £68.09k £34.06k £42.23k £42.28k
Total expenditure £27.36k £55.94k £39.52k £44.46k £43.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £50.34k £14.58k £750 N/A