Accounts and annual returns CHILL OUT ZONE LTD

Charity number: 1125161
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 June 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 30 June 2017 30 days late
Annual return 31 July 2015 17 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 17 May 2016 On Time