Financial history BARR'S HILL SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1125444
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014
Total gross income £5.00k £10.00k £5.00k £13.81k £1.51k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £4.86k £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A