Accounts and annual returns MENTER Y MOELWYN

Charity number: 1126398
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 06 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 29 December 2011 On Time