Accounts and annual returns PLAYING FOR SUCCESS SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1126636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2012 30 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 15 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 14 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 26 October 2010 On Time