Accounts and annual returns THE ROSEMARY WHITE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125832
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 July 2019 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 July 2019 153 days late
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time