Financial history HEATHER ST JOHNS JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1126735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £37.88k £31.81k £42.97k £46.60k £82.65k
Total expenditure £38.26k £31.38k £47.04k £47.26k £73.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A