Financial history RIVERS OF JOY MINISTRIES (SWANSEA)

Charity number: 1125800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.53k £19.08k £19.82k £20.04k £20.29k
Total expenditure £24.47k £17.77k £16.50k £21.56k £21.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A