Financial history THE FACET FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1126003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.44m £405.39k £610.59k £1.71m £915.87k
Total expenditure £1.02m £803.84k £795.10k £665.45k £2.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.42m N/A £609.73k £1.71m £896.86k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £576 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.44k N/A £859 £5.24k £18.01k
Income - Other £15.74k N/A £0 £953 £1.00k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m N/A £5.84k £593.87k £12.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £773.73k £508 £2.05m
Expenditure - Governance £7.01k N/A £5.57k £0 £1.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.01m N/A £0 £593.87k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £15.54k £71.07k £29.20k