Financial history THE LANCASHIRE UNITED TRANSPORT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1125835
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £2.30k £1.78k £1.16k £1.58k £755
Total expenditure £2.71k £1.67k £1.22k £1.62k £775
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A