Financial history WEAPONS OF REVIVAL CHURCH (UK)

Charity Number: 1125911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.25k £10.14k £13.01k £7.75k £10.60k
Total expenditure £5.16k £9.38k £13.20k £8.99k £10.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A