Financial history EYDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1125650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.72k £70.68k £30.05k £5.29k £6.99k
Total expenditure £3.36k £62.21k £28.96k £3.05k £4.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.50k N/A N/A