Accounts and annual returns THE ROSE ADEANE TRUST

Charity Number: 1125744
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 June 2021 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 June 2021 130 days late
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 19 February 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required