Financial history AL- AMIN JAME MOSQUE

Charity number: 1128321
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.67k £6.04k £12.73k £14.13k £11.87k
Total expenditure £8.90k £6.39k £13.58k £13.77k £10.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A