Financial history SOUTHWOOD SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1126066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.29k £298 £956 £9.12k £2.20k
Total expenditure £2.18k £2.90k £202 £778 £3.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A