Accounts and annual returns VRAJ RAS PARIVAR

Charity number: 1126189
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 July 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 22 July 2016 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 30 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required