Accounts and annual returns BEECHES PERFORMANCE ENSEMBLE

Charity number: 1126465
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 February 2025 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window