Financial history CHILDREN OF MASINDI UGANDA

Charity number: 1128246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £3.57k £2.77k £2.39k £11.53k £6.90k
Total expenditure £6.13k £2.27k £812 £11.97k £11.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A