Financial history MILLIE MITTOO CHILDREN'S PROJECTS

Charity number: 1126278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £34.47k £40.02k £25.05k £27.95k £19.31k
Total expenditure £27.42k £41.54k £30.33k £23.15k £410
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A