Financial history CEEP LIMITED

Charity number: 1128071
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £71.25k £50.83k £21.21k £88.28k £119.70k
Total expenditure £74.60k £66.84k £23.14k £75.46k £123.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £18.34k N/A £85.00k
Income from government grants £24.40k £24.00k N/A £51.00k N/A