Accounts and annual returns OPERA UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1126657
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2012 28 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2011 10 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2010 11 November 2011 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 15 August 2011 On Time