Trustees MOROCCAN CHILDREN'S TRUST
Charity number: 1127739

Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Roy | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sibley | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marine Brichard | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Booth | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachida Bentanoute | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adeel Belorf | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JESSICA THOMAS | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aicha Alaoui | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nick Denison | Trustee | 07 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER EDWARD HANDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.