Financial history PRO ACTION HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1127528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £178.93k £98.85k £88.50k £75.15k £76.53k
Total expenditure £310.41k £90.33k £89.68k £88.78k £92.19k
Income from government contracts N/A £54.18k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £24.21k £50.00k £50.00k £50.00k