Accounts and annual returns PEOPLE'S BUREAU OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING LTD

Charity number: 1132459
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2023 22 April 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 22 May 2023 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 April 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required